NY S05316 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the safety of amusement devices at places of public accommodation; authorizes the commissioner to make rules relating to the assembly, disassembly and use of such amusement devices.
Title
Relates to the safety of amusement devices at places of public accommodation; authorizes the commissioner to make rules relating to the assembly, disassembly and use of such amusement devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.671 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08187 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.594