NY S05395 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3213A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3213A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that employees are automatically enrolled into the secure choice savings program and if they do not want to participate in the program, they must opt out.
Title
Ensures that employees are automatically enrolled into the secure choice savings program and if they do not want to participate in the program, they must opt out.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3213A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1450 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5395A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03213 (Same As) 2021-10-21 - signed chap.452