NY S05402 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain funds in NY ABLE savings accounts from the calculation of household benefits under public assistance programs.
Title
Exempts certain funds in NY ABLE savings accounts from the calculation of household benefits under public assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.329 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.291 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7817 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1387 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A07817 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.329