NY S05420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.
Title
Relates to modular construction work; provides that modular construction shall comply with any existing municipal licensing requirements for all electrical, plumbing, and fire suppression work.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.574 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02933 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor