NY S05421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Title
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.67 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7498a |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.167 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5421A |
2020-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.642 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07498 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - VETOED MEMO.67