NY S05443 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - referred to libraries and education technology
Pending: Assembly Libraries and Education Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the membership of the board of trustees of the Queens Borough Public Library.
Title
Relates to the membership of the board of trustees of the Queens Borough Public Library.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1186 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5443B |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5443A |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1320 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08074 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to libraries and education technology