NY S05467 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to primary social security retirement benefits for certain members; provides that in the computation of the normal service retirement benefit of members of the New York city fire department pension fund, there shall be no reduction for the primary social security retirement benefit.
Title
Relates to primary social security retirement benefits for certain members; provides that in the computation of the normal service retirement benefit of members of the New York city fire department pension fund, there shall be no reduction for the primary social security retirement benefit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5467A |
2024-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05480 (Same As) 2024-02-09 - print number 5480b