NY S05500 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.560
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.560
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to municipal energy aggregation programs; authorizes inter-municipal agreement for the purpose of coordinating efforts by municipal energy aggregators to requests bids for and potentially select an energy service provider to provide electric and/or gas supply services to participating customers.
Title
Relates to municipal energy aggregation programs; authorizes inter-municipal agreement for the purpose of coordinating efforts by municipal energy aggregators to requests bids for and potentially select an energy service provider to provide electric and/or gas supply services to participating customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.560 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.815 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7896c |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1506 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5500D |
2014-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5500C |
2014-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5500B |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5500A |
2013-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07896 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s5500d