NY S05518 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declares a climate emergency and places a ban on new fossil fuel infrastructure projects but shall not apply to repairs or maintenance of existing infrastructure.
Title
Declares a climate emergency and places a ban on new fossil fuel infrastructure projects but shall not apply to repairs or maintenance of existing infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5518B |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5518A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05399 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation