NY S05529 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5529A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5529A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables public employers to offer an age fifty-five with ten years of service or age fifty with twenty-five years of service temporary retirement incentives for certain public employees.
Title
Enables public employers to offer an age fifty-five with ten years of service or age fifty with twenty-five years of service temporary retirement incentives for certain public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5529A |
2024-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05213 (Same As) 2024-04-12 - print number 5213a