NY S05546 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the New York city retirement system to redesignate former corrections officer John K. Filipowicz's retirement option to the most favorable option for his surviving spouse.
Title
Authorizes and directs the New York city retirement system to redesignate former corrections officer John K. Filipowicz's retirement option to the most favorable option for his surviving spouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1373 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |