NY S05667 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 5667B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 5667B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "The Divorce Reform Act of 2010"; provides that maintenance may be required to be paid either permanently or for a fixed period of time; provides that the failure to state in an agreement between the parties or in a court order that the remarriage of the recipient of maintenance shall cause the termination of such maintenance, shall not bar the termination thereof; makes the post-divorce standards of living of the parties and the loss of health insurance benefits factors in determining the disposition of property; establishes irreconcilable differences as a ground for divorce; provides for payment of attorneys' and expert fees in matrimonial actions, including to obtain maintenance or distribution of property after a foreign divorce.
Title
Enacts "The Divorce Reform Act of 2010"; provides that maintenance may be required to be paid either permanently or for a fixed period of time; provides that the failure to state in an agreement between the parties or in a court order that the remarriage of the recipient of maintenance shall cause the termination of such maintenance, shall not bar the termination thereof; makes the post-divorce standards of living of the parties and the loss of health insurance benefits factors in determining the disposition of property; establishes irreconcilable differences as a ground for divorce; provides for payment of attorneys' and expert fees in matrimonial actions, including to obtain maintenance or distribution of property after a foreign divorce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | PRINT NUMBER 5667B | |
2010-05-21 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-01-14 | PRINT NUMBER 5667A | |
2010-01-14 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-27 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A2580-B (Same As) 2010-10-01 - enacting clause stricken