NY S05752 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the burial of indigent veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Relates to the burial of indigent veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-22 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.33 |
2015-12-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.579 |
2015-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7867a |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1508 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5752A |
2015-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07867 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5752a