NY S05759 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5759A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5759A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Title
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5759A |
2020-02-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07722 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - print number 7722a