NY A07722 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - print number 7722a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - print number 7722a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Title
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | print number 7722a |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05759 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5759A