NY S05807 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions relating to eligibility of dependents of military service members for certain developmental disability services impacted by the assignment of such service member outside of the state.
Title
Amends provisions relating to eligibility of dependents of military service members for certain developmental disability services impacted by the assignment of such service member outside of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.256 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7927 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.952 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07927 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5807