NY S05828 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.273
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.273
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the lake of Drew in Westchester county within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Includes the lake of Drew in Westchester county within the definition of "inland waterways" for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.273 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1780 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5828A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.371 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Senate | print number 6571a |
2019-06-04 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6571A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1780 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5828A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06571 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.273