NY S05844 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.129
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.129
Summary
Authorizes the county of Orange to establish hotel and motel taxes in the amount of five percent.
Title
Authorizes the county of Orange to establish hotel and motel taxes in the amount of five percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7143B | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.695 | |
2009-06-11 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07143 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.129
S50322 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64322 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65033 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50322 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64322 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65033 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05844&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |