NY S05871 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Title
Relates to establishing the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.50 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.661 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1404 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5871 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.532 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-29 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-11 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6520 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1404 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06520 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.50