NY S05900 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5900B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5900B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Title
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5900B |
2020-07-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5900A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08179 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - print number 8179a