NY S05918 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.211
Status: Introduced on June 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.211
Summary
Relates to rate of regular interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for calculating contributions to the NYC employees' retirement system.
Title
Relates to rate of regular interest used in the actuarial valuation of liabilities for calculating contributions to the NYC employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8933 | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.705 | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08933 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.211
S50050 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60410 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65009 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50050 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60410 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65009 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05918&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |