NY S05918 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to validity of a license to carry and possess a firearm in the city of New York where the licensee is a dealer, manufacturer or gunsmith of firearms and is carrying or possessing the firearms in the course of their employment.
Title
Relates to validity of a license to carry and possess a firearm in the city of New York where the licensee is a dealer, manufacturer or gunsmith of firearms and is carrying or possessing the firearms in the course of their employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06058 (Same As) 2015-11-25 - enacting clause stricken
A10330 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - referred to codes
A10330 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - referred to codes