NY S05925 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants excused leave to public officers, employees of the state, county, municipality or school district to undertake screening for cancer.
Title
Grants excused leave to public officers, employees of the state, county, municipality or school district to undertake screening for cancer.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.465 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.473 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2830b |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1799 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02830 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5925