NY S05942 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6766
Status: Introduced on June 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6766
Summary
Establishes a small business energy assistance and advocacy services program as part of the division of small business to assist small businesses in accessing energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy programs available through public and private sources; requires notice to be given to the division of small business prior to any rate increase; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a small business energy assistance and advocacy services program as part of the division of small business to assist small businesses in accessing energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy programs available through public and private sources; requires notice to be given to the division of small business prior to any rate increase; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6766 | |
2010-06-22 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1087 | |
2010-06-22 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-09 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-06-19 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A6766 (Same As) 2010-09-18 - tabled
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05942&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |