NY S05942 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5942A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5942A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to long-term contracts for renewable energy.
Title
Relates to long-term contracts for renewable energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5942A |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01540 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - print number 1540a