NY S05942 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives fishing, hunting and trapping license fees for certain first responders.
Title
Waives fishing, hunting and trapping license fees for certain first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-10-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5942A |
2023-10-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08180 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation