NY S06035 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the lawful sale of scrap copper and other metals by junk dealers; restricts sale of certain items; increases existing penalties.
Title
Provides for the lawful sale of scrap copper and other metals by junk dealers; restricts sale of certain items; increases existing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-05-25 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2009-06-21 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10947 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - reported referred to codes