NY S06035 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for the crimes of criminal diversion of prescription medications and prescriptions in the first, second, third and fourth degrees and criminal sale of a prescription.
Title
Increases penalties for the crimes of criminal diversion of prescription medications and prescriptions in the first, second, third and fourth degrees and criminal sale of a prescription.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.710 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09033 (Same As) 2012-05-22 - held for consideration in codes