NY S06035 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6035A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 6035A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to death certificates for persons whose death is caused by an opioid overdose.
Title
Relates to death certificates for persons whose death is caused by an opioid overdose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6035A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08870 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO HEALTH