NY S06055 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to coverage for oral chemotherapy.
Title
Relates to coverage for oral chemotherapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8906 |
2012-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.12 |
2012-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08906 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - signed chap.12