NY S06059 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Tier II provisions to all police officers and firefighters who join a public retirement system on or after July 1, 2009 and prior to July 1, 2011.
Title
Extends the Tier II provisions to all police officers and firefighters who join a public retirement system on or after July 1, 2009 and prior to July 1, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | |
2009-06-24 | REFERRED TO RULES |