NY S06061 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - SIGNED CHAP.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - SIGNED CHAP.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for appointments to the office of associate judge of the court of appeals where the vacancy is caused by governor's appointment, upon advice and consent of the senate, for chief judge of the court of appeals.
Title
Provides for appointments to the office of associate judge of the court of appeals where the vacancy is caused by governor's appointment, upon advice and consent of the senate, for chief judge of the court of appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.123 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | substituted for a5983 |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.572 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05983 (Same As) 2023-03-31 - substituted by s6061