NY S06149 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides bicycle access to public office buildings for state employees, contractors and visitors; requires the commissioner of general services to make an inventory of all existing bicycle parking and storage facilities at all state office buildings and office buildings in which the state leases or occupies space.
Title
Provides bicycle access to public office buildings for state employees, contractors and visitors; requires the commissioner of general services to make an inventory of all existing bicycle parking and storage facilities at all state office buildings and office buildings in which the state leases or occupies space.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2009-08-31 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A9543 (Same As) 2010-01-13 - referred to governmental operations