NY S06149 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - PRINT NUMBER 6149B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the imposition of an occupancy tax in the town of DeWitt to benefit Willis Carrier Park and promote tourism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the imposition of an occupancy tax in the town of DeWitt to benefit Willis Carrier Park and promote tourism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 6149B
2019-06-19SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 6149A
2019-06-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07706 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.189

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback