NY S06202 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.
Title
Relates to direct marketing activities for New York beverages; and authorizes the sale of beer and wine at movie theaters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6202A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07681 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to economic development