NY S06209 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Sir Henry's law" to require the informed consent of the owner of a companion animal prior to euthanizing such animal.
Title
Enacts "Sir Henry's law" to require the informed consent of the owner of a companion animal prior to euthanizing such animal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.739 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |