NY S06209 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from three million dollars to four millions dollars the cost of 10 projects which shall be located at the STEM at Blodgett Middle School, the Corcoran High School, the Delaware Primary School, the Henninger High School, the Syracuse Latin School, the Lincoln Middle School, the Nottingham High School, the Roberts PreK-8 School, the Seymour Dual Language Academy and the Webster Elementary School.
Title
Increases from three million dollars to four millions dollars the cost of 10 projects which shall be located at the STEM at Blodgett Middle School, the Corcoran High School, the Delaware Primary School, the Henninger High School, the Syracuse Latin School, the Lincoln Middle School, the Nottingham High School, the Roberts PreK-8 School, the Seymour Dual Language Academy and the Webster Elementary School.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6431 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1384 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06431 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.569