NY S06222 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to water withdrawal reporting and FOIL protection.
Title
Relates to water withdrawal reporting and FOIL protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.75 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09009 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - referred to agriculture