NY S06246 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6868A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6868A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the people's history project within the department of parks, recreation and historic preservation to foster the recognition of heretofore overlooked personages, sites, and events of historical significance; provides for the establishment of a committee to pass on nominations made by the citizens of this state for the inclusion of personages, sites, and events in the project; provides for suitable commemorative markers, a map and website listings of such.
Title
Creates the people's history project within the department of parks, recreation and historic preservation to foster the recognition of heretofore overlooked personages, sites, and events of historical significance; provides for the establishment of a committee to pass on nominations made by the citizens of this state for the inclusion of personages, sites, and events in the project; provides for suitable commemorative markers, a map and website listings of such.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6868A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1937 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6246A |
2018-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06868 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.404