NY S06269 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.314
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Subjects certain lands in the town of Blooming Grove and Chester, Orange county, acquired for a public use by the commissioners of the Palisades Interstate park, exclusive of improvements erected thereon by the state, to real property taxation; applies to assessment rolls prepared on the basis of taxable status dates occurring on or after the date on which this act becomes law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subjects certain lands in the town of Blooming Grove and Chester, Orange county, acquired for a public use by the commissioners of the Palisades Interstate park, exclusive of improvements erected thereon by the state, to real property taxation; applies to assessment rolls prepared on the basis of taxable status dates occurring on or after the date on which this act becomes law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.314
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7952a
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1844
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 6269A
2018-01-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2064
2017-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07952 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6269a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06269&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06269&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06269
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06269&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06269A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6269#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6269#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6269#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6269#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6269#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06269&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback