NY S06302 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of elections to print in bold type the date and time of all upcoming primary and general elections on address verification notices sent out prior to elections.
Title
Requires the board of elections to print in bold type the date and time of all upcoming primary and general elections on address verification notices sent out prior to elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.200 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.790 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6302A |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-15 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.72 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | amended on third reading 1385b |
2019-05-06 | Senate | amended on third reading 1385a |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.226 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to election law |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1385B |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.790 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6302A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01385 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.200