NY S06306 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties of Washington and Saratoga to waive certain fees for veterans' organizations.
Title
Authorizes the counties of Washington and Saratoga to waive certain fees for veterans' organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.483 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1791 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6306 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.427 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8109 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1791 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08109 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.483