NY S06406 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization of the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property to 12/01/2025.
Title
Extends authorization of the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property to 12/01/2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.332 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.645 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6580 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-24 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.949 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06580 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s6406