NY S06409 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to raising the tax abatement rate and extending certain deadlines for purposes of the green roof tax abatement for certain properties in a city of one million or more persons.
Title
Relates to raising the tax abatement rate and extending certain deadlines for purposes of the green roof tax abatement for certain properties in a city of one million or more persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.696 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6409A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06901 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation