NY S06445 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the county-wide shared services initiative and enhances the flexibility within.
Title
Extends the county-wide shared services initiative and enhances the flexibility within.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.294 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.686 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7694a |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1563 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6445A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07759 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments
A07694 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6445a
A07694 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6445a