NY S06482 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations and public benefit corporations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment.
Title
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations and public benefit corporations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.518 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8964 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08964 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6482