NY S06495 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6495A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6495A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to publish certain information in local, community and ethnic media; defines local, community and ethnic media; requires the office of general services to develop and maintain a list of local, community and ethnic media outlets.
Title
Requires state agencies to publish certain information in local, community and ethnic media; defines local, community and ethnic media; requires the office of general services to develop and maintain a list of local, community and ethnic media outlets.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6495A |
2024-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06879 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - print number 6879a