NY S06542 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words fireman or policeman with the words firefighter or police officer or variation thereof.
Title
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words fireman or policeman with the words firefighter or police officer or variation thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.476 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.601 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | substituted for a8321c |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.302 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6542B |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1817 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6542A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08321 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - substituted by s6542b