NY S06672 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.465
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial assistance to establish a public awareness program on the availability of long term health care insurance, the financing thereof and the provision of tax credits for premiums paid therefor; accelerates payment of death benefits and special surrender values upon receipt of the insured of end of life or palliative care.
Title
Directs the department of financial assistance to establish a public awareness program on the availability of long term health care insurance, the financing thereof and the provision of tax credits for premiums paid therefor; accelerates payment of death benefits and special surrender values upon receipt of the insured of end of life or palliative care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.465 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.286 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a8957a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1261 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6672A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08957 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6672a