NY S06682 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that within ten days of an incident, the director shall provide to the qualified person a copy of the written incident report, offer to hold a meeting with such qualified person to discuss the incident, and provide such qualified person with a written report on the actions taken to address the incident; further provides for the director to provide such reports electronically.
Title
Provides that within ten days of an incident, the director shall provide to the qualified person a copy of the written incident report, offer to hold a meeting with such qualified person to discuss the incident, and provide such qualified person with a written report on the actions taken to address the incident; further provides for the director to provide such reports electronically.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-09-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |